Vedic Maths

Vedic Maths For Govt Jobs Exams- Simple & Fun Way To Do Maths

Vedic Maths is a collection of Techniques/methods to solve mathematical problems in an easy and faster way. It consists of 16 Sutras (Formulae) and 13 sub-sutras (Sub Formulae) which can be used for problems involved in arithmetic, algebra, geometry, calculus, conics. Vedic Mathematics is a system of mathematics which was discovered by Indian mathematician Jagadguru Shri Bharathi Krishna Tirthaji in the period between A.D. 1911 and 1918 and published his findings in a Vedic Mathematics Book by Tirthaji Maharaj. Veda is a Sanskrit word which means ‘Knowledge’.

Using regular mathematical steps, solving problems sometimes are complex and very time consuming. But using Vedic Mathematic’s General Techniques (applicable to all sets of given data) and Specific Techniques (applicable to specific sets of given data), numerical calculations can be done very fast.

Advantages of Using Vedic Maths Tricks Govt Jobs Exam

Vedic Maths is the most significant way to solve the numerical problems in minimal time. It is advantageous for the aspirants who are preparing for the competitive exams and help to overcome the ‘mathematics phobia’.

If you are not aware of the benefits offered by the Vedic maths then, you can check all of them below. We have compiled the list of advantages of learning Vedic maths formulas.

Easy Way to Learn
  • Vedic Maths is a simpler and interesting way of learning the Maths tricks than the usual Maths. The tricks and the sutras used in the Vedic Maths are profound which makes it simpler in learning.
Helps in Cross-Checking
  • Cross-checking the Maths paper becomes difficult because of the complex calculations but once you are habitual of using Vedic Maths tricks you will be able to cross check the solutions in minimal time.
Enhance Logical Thinking
  • One of the most beneficial benefits of using Vedic Maths trick is that it enriches the logical thinking and understanding the Maths problems.
Improve Confidence
  • Confidence is not something that can be learned in a day. Practicing the Vedic Maths on a regular basis will also compliment you with the self-confidence for solving the tricky Maths solutions.
More Systematic Way of Learning
  • Vedic Maths provides more systematic, simplified, unified & faster way than the conventional system. Vedic Mathematics offers a new and entirely different approach to the study of Mathematics based on pattern recognition, which helps the students to be more creative and learn faster.

Improves the Performance in Competitive Level Exams

  • One can do calculations in a much faster way than the typical methods taught in the school. These methods helped to solve the mathematical problems in a different way but when you are in the competitive world you need to be speedier and more accurate to qualify the exam.

How Vedic Maths is Beneficial and What are the Advantages of Vedic Mathematics

Vedic Maths can definitely solve mathematical numerical calculations in a faster way. Some Vedic Math Scholars mentioned that Using Vedic Maths tricks you can do calculations 10-15 times faster than our usual methods.

Lets take 1 example to see the Power of Vedic Maths.

Example 1: Multiplying by 11

When multiplying by 11 using long multiplication a pattern to the working out can be discovered e.g.

 46     876     4386      432672
 11x     11x      11x         11x
 --     ---     ----     -------
 46     876     4386      432672
460+   8760+   43860+    4326720+
---    ----    -----    --------
506    9636    48246     4759392
---    ----    -----    --------

How much time will you take to multiply by 11. You can see that in the addition section of each long multiplication above, each column apart from the first and last is the sum of the original digit in the column and the next one (to the right). Once you know this you can just write down the result of multiplying any number by 11.
Working from right to left:

  1. Write the rightmost digit down.
  2. Add each pair of digits and write the result down right to left (carrying digits where necessary).
  3. Finally write down the left most digit.

It would take just 7-8 seconds to calculate the number in just 1 line.

e.g.

  • Multiply 712×11

{\displaystyle {\begin{matrix}&7&&1&&2\\&\swarrow \searrow &+&\swarrow \searrow &+&\swarrow \searrow \\7&&8&&3&&2\end{matrix}}}

712×11=7832

The reason for working from right to left instead of the more usual left to right is so any carries can be added in as you go along. e.g.

  • Multiply 8738×11
{\displaystyle {\begin{matrix}&8&&7&&3&&8\\&\swarrow \searrow &+&\swarrow \searrow &+&\swarrow \searrow &+&\swarrow \searrow \\9&\leftarrow _{1}&6&\leftarrow _{1}&1&\leftarrow _{1}&1&&8\end{matrix}}}

8738×11=96118

Square Root Using Vedic Mathematics Check Here

Cube Root Using Vedic Mathematics Check Here

Now as an extension of the same principle,

Units digits of the multiplier and the multiplicand must add to 10, the remaining digits being same, one can apply the same principle.

Eg 37*23 will not work as 7+3=10, however remaining digits need to be same. Here they are different.

37*33=(3*(3+1))/(7*3)=3*4/21=1221

Square Root Using Vedic Mathematics for Govt exam

Vedic Maths Quiz

This Quiz is Based on the vedic maths Concept to increase you mental calculation Habit. Anybody can attempt the test and it will improve the mental mathematics ability sharply. its tested and uniqe way of learning. All the best to excel in the Quiz.

  1. Multiply 14×1

(A) 154
(B) 156
(C) 451
(D) 416

Click Here to view Answer

Solution: A
Archery:

Solution :

Add digits of 14

1  1+4  4

154

2. Multiply 451 × 11

(A) 4691
(B) 4691
(C) 6941
(D) 1496

Click Here to view Answer

Solution: B
Archery:

Solution:

Add digits of 451

4 4+5 5+1 1

4961

3. Mutiply 6789×11

(A) 74769
(B) 74679
(C) 77469
(D) 77649

Click Here to view Answer

Solution: B
Archery:

Solution :

Add digits of 6789

6 6+7 7+8 8+9 9

6  13 15 17 9 (Add Carry Over to the left digit)

+1 +1 +1

74679

4. Multiply 1345×11

(A) 14957
(B) 14597
(C) 14795
(D) 41795

Click Here to view Answer

Solution: C
Archery:

Add digits of 1345

1 1+3 3+4 4+5 5

14795

5. Multiply 123456×11

(A) 1358016
(B) 1538016
(C) 1530186
(D) 1015386

Click Here to view Answer

Solution: A
Archery:

Solution :

Add digits of 123456

1 1+2 2+3 3+4 4+5 5+6 6

1 3 5 7 9 11 6 (Add carry over to the left digit)

1358016