**Multiplication by 11: View Here Some Tips and Tricks for Multiplication by 11**

In this blog, we are giving you Maths Tricks for Bank and Government Exams. These Fast Maths tricks will help you solve the Questions asked in Quantitative Aptitude Section of the various Bank and Government Exams like RBI Grade B, SBI PO, IBPS RRB Officer, SSC CGL, SSC CPO and Railway RRB Exams. All such exams require candidates to solve a high number of Questions in Less Time.

Hello everyone, let us try to understand the multiplication

rule of 11. How to write multiplication of any number with 11 in say 5 seconds so,

Let’s take the first example over here say 14 x 11

To understand the multiplication by 11 trick, take a look at the following multiplication below:

Did you make the following two important observations?

First, notice that the digits of the number that is multiplied by 11 appear again in the answer

Second, the number in the middle of the answer is always found by adding the digits of the number that is multiplied by 11

This is the basic facts that you have to remember to quickly multiply numbers by 11

Therefore, if you want to use this trick, all you have to do is add the digits of the number and put the answer between the number

**Other examples for three digit multiplication by 11**

**Example: **123 × 11

- Write the digit 3 at units place.
- Add the digits 2 and 3 so, 2 plus 3 gives us 5.
- Now, add 1 and 2 so, 1 plus 2 gives us 3.
- Write digit 1 at thousands place.

so the answer is going to be **1353.**

**Multiplication by 11 Using Vedic Maths Quiz**

This Quiz is based on the Vedic maths Concept to increase your mental calculation Habit. Anybody can attempt the test and it will improve the mental mathematics ability sharply. its tested and unique way of learning. All the best to excel in the Quiz.

- Multiply 15×11

(A) 164

(B) 165

(C) 466

(D) 467

## Click Here to view Answer

Solution: B

Add digits of 15

1 1+5 5

165

2. Multiply 451 × 11

(A) 4691

(B) 4691

(C) 6941

(D) 1496

## Click Here to view Answer

Solution: B

Add digits of 451

4 4+5 5+1 1

4961

3. Mutiply 6789×11

(A) 74769

(B) 74679

(C) 77469

(D) 77649

## Click Here to view Answer

Solution: B

Add digits of 6789

6 6+7 7+8 8+9 9

6 13 15 17 9 (Add Carry Over to the left digit)

+1 +1 +1

74679

4. Multiply 1345×11

(A) 14957

(B) 14597

(C) 14795

(D) 41795

## Click Here to view Answer

Solution: C

Add digits of 1345

1 1+3 3+4 4+5 5

14795

5. Multiply 123456×11

(A) 1358016

(B) 1538016

(C) 1530186

(D) 1015386

## Click Here to view Answer

Solution: A

Add digits of 123456

1 1+2 2+3 3+4 4+5 5+6 6

1 3 5 7 9 11 6 (Add carry over to the left digit)

1358016